NH SB325 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0137; Effective 06/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0137; Effective 06/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to oil spill preparedness and response.
Title
Relative to oil spill preparedness and response.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
Rep. Marcia Hammon [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - Divide (Y: 124 N: 186 NV: 36 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0137; Effective 06/16/14 |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled 05/01/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Div 186-104 |
2014-04-23 | House | Divide Sections 4 & 5 (Rep. D. McGuire) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 124-186 |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-03 | House | =RESCHEDULED=Executive Session: 4/16/14 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-04-02 | House | =CANCELLED=Executive Session: 4/15/14 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/10/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1099s, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1099s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1099s, 3/27/14; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Recommit to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0922s, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | ===ROOM CHANGE===Hearing: 3/5/14, Room 306-308, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing: 3/5/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |