NH SB319 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2014; Chapter 0081; Effective 07/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2014; Chapter 0081; Effective 07/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to reproductive health care facilities.
Title
Relative to access to reproductive health care facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Concur (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reconsider (Y: 94 N: 169 NV: 78 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 162 N: 100 NV: 79 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Table (Y: 86 N: 152 NV: 102 Abs: 47) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Limit Debate (Y: 143 N: 150 NV: 52 Abs: 42) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Amend to Limit Debate (Y: 144 N: 147 NV: 55 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Uphold Ruling of the Chair (Y: 192 N: 99 NV: 55 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Previous Question (Y: 231 N: 61 NV: 54 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Table (Y: 117 N: 174 NV: 55 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-1839h (Y: 79 N: 209 NV: 58 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-1833h (Y: 105 N: 179 NV: 62 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reconsider (Y: 94 N: 169 NV: 78 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 162 N: 100 NV: 79 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Table (Y: 86 N: 152 NV: 102 Abs: 47) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Limit Debate (Y: 143 N: 150 NV: 52 Abs: 42) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Amend to Limit Debate (Y: 144 N: 147 NV: 55 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Uphold Ruling of the Chair (Y: 192 N: 99 NV: 55 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Previous Question (Y: 231 N: 61 NV: 54 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Table (Y: 117 N: 174 NV: 55 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-1839h (Y: 79 N: 209 NV: 58 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-1833h (Y: 105 N: 179 NV: 62 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2014; Chapter 0081; Effective 07/10/2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-28 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Concur, Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 13Y-10N; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Concurrence with House Amendment #1720h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Concur, Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 14Y-9N; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Concurrence with House Amendment #1720h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved Concur with House Amendment #1720h, Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 14Y-9N; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1720h; Requests C of C, Motion Failed, Division Vote 10Y-13N; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-16 | House | Reconsideration (Rep Shurtleff) Motion Failed 94-169 |
2014-05-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1720h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 162-100 |
2014-05-16 | House | Lay Bill on Table (Rep Jasper) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 86-152 |
2014-05-16 | House | Limit Debate to 30" (Rep Shurtleff) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 143-150 |
2014-05-16 | House | Rep Baldasaro Amendment to Limit Debate to 4"; Motion Failed Regular Calendar 144-147 |
2014-05-16 | House | Uphold Ruling of the Chair; Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-99 |
2014-05-16 | House | Previous Question; Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 231-61 |
2014-05-16 | House | Lay SB319 on Table (Rep Jones) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 117-174 |
2014-05-16 | House | Previous Question (Rep G. Richardson) |
2014-05-16 | House | Amend to Limit Debate to 4" per speaker (Rep. Baldasaro) |
2014-05-15 | House | Amend to Limit Debate to 5" per speaker (Rep C. McGuire) Motion Failed Div 110-176 |
2014-05-15 | House | Limit Debate to 30" per side (Rep Shurtleff) |
2014-05-15 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1839h (Rep Groen) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 79-209 |
2014-05-15 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1833h (Rep Itse) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 105-179 |
2014-05-15 | House | Amendment #2014-1720h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-05-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1720h (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-04-30 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/6/2014 10:00 Amendment |
2014-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2014 12:00 PM or at lunch break from session Legislative Office Building 208=RECESSED= |
2014-04-15 | House | ==REVISED== Public Hearing: 4/22/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/22/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-03-19 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-03-19 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Sen. Soucy moved Ought to Pass |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 5 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Sen. Cataldo Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 5 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Special Order SB 319 to the end of the Commerce Committee, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 5 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 1/28/14, Room 100, State House, 9:55 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |