NH SB318 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-06-29 - Senate Chapter 0285; Effective 08/26/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to voter registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to voter registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-27 - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - SHALL SB 318 BECOME LAW (Y: 232 N: 110 NV: 36 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Committee of Conference Report 2409 (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - C OF C #2409C (REP BATES) (Y: 260 N: 101 NV: 15 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - OTP/AM 2101H AND 2223H (Y: 224 N: 102 NV: 41 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-29 Senate Chapter 0285; Effective 08/26/2012
2012-06-27 House Shall SB 318 Become Law: Veto Overriden, Regular Calendar 232-110 By Necessary Two-Thirds Vote; House Journal 53, PG.2639-2641
2012-06-27 Senate Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 318 Become Law: Regular Calendar 18Y-5N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote
2012-06-20 Senate Vetoed by Governor 06/20/2012, Senate Calendar 22
2012-06-06 Senate Enrolled
2012-06-06 House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.2613
2012-06-06 Senate Conference Committee Report 2409c; Regular Calendar 18Y-5N, Adopted
2012-06-06 House Conference Committee Report #2409c Adopted, Regular Calendar 260-101; House Journal 51, PG.2551-2554
2012-05-31 House Conference Committee Report #2012-2409c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 42, PG.2264
2012-05-29 Senate Conferee Change; Senator Boutin Replaces Senator Merrill
2012-05-29 Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2012, 1:30 p.m., Room 100, State House
2012-05-24 Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2012, 9:00 a.m., Room 100, State House
2012-05-24 House Speaker Appoints: Reps Bates, Tucker, W.Smith, and DeLemus [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2488
2012-05-24 House House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Tucker) [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2488
2012-05-23 Senate President Appoints: Senators Barnes, Carson, and Merrill
2012-05-23 Senate Sen. Barnes Moved Non-concur with House Amendment #2101h, #2223h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2012-05-15 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2101h and #2223h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 224-102; House Journal 43, PG.2321-2328
2012-05-15 House Floor Amendment #2012-2223h (Rep Bates): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2321-2328
2012-05-15 House Amendment #2101h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2321-2328
2012-05-10 House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 37, PG.2040
2012-05-10 House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2012-2101h; House Calendar 37, PG.2093-2097
2012-05-10 House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2101h for May 15 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2040
2012-05-03 House Executive Session: 5/10/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2012-05-03 House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/8/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2012-05-02 House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/3/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2012-04-18 House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/25/2012 Legislative Office Building 306 1:00 PM or 30 Minutes Following House Sesson
2012-04-04 House Public Hearing: 4/10/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2012-03-21 House Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 28, PG.1719
2012-03-21 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1132s, New Title, 1301s, New Title, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg. 257
2012-03-21 Senate Sen. Barnes Floor Amendment #2012-1301s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg. 247
2012-03-21 Senate Committee Amendment 1132s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg. 243
2012-03-08 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1132s, New Title, 3/21/12; Senate Calendar 11
2012-02-09 Senate Hearing: === RECONVENE === 2/21/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7
2012-02-09 Senate Hearing: === RECESSED === 1/24/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 a.m.
2012-01-04 Senate Hearing: 1/24/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2
2012-01-01 Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.10

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2983&sy=2012&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&q=1
Texthttp://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2012/SB0318.html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=40&sy=2012&lb=S&eb=SB0318&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=2983
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=246&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=SB0318&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=2983
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=286&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=SB0318&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=2983
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=117&sy=2012&lb=S&eb=SB0318&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=2983
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=308&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=SB0318&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=2983
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=127&sy=2012&lb=S&eb=SB0318&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=2983

Bill Comments

feedback