NH SB315 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 10-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 10-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the board of building officials.
Title
Establishing the board of building officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 10-4) |
2014-10-01 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-08-20 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-08-04 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-04-23 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/14 1:00 PM, or one hour following House Session, Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/9/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments & Administration |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0890s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0890s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0890s, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/14, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |