NH SB295 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Sen. Sanborn Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1252h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Sen. Sanborn Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1252h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from using credit history in employment decisions.
Title
Prohibiting an employer from using credit history in employment decisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - OTPA (Y: 192 N: 142 NV: 16 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1252h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2014-04-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1252h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-142 |
2014-04-16 | House | Amendment #2014-1252h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-04-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1252h (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 27 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/8/14 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services, INDUSTRIAL AND REHABILITATIVE SERVICES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0873s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0873s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0873s, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 1/28/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce |