NH SB266 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2012; Chapter 0150; Effective 06/07/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2012; Chapter 0150; Effective 06/07/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting electric utilities from installing and maintaining smart meter gateway devices without the residential or business property owner's consent.
Title
Prohibiting electric utilities from installing and maintaining smart meter gateway devices without the residential or business property owner's consent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2012; Chapter 0150; Effective 06/07/2012 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-17 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2495 | |
2012-05-16 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 240-49; House Journal 44, PG.2428-2429 | |
2012-05-16 | House Floor Amendment #2012-2243h (Rep Kurk): Amendment Failed Division Vote 78-211; House Journal 44, PG.2428-2429 | |
2012-05-16 | House Special Order to Next Order of Business: Without Objection; House Journal 44, PG.2428-2429 | |
2012-05-09 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 37, PG.2047-2048 | |
2012-05-09 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 15 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2047-2048 | |
2012-04-18 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-04-04 | House Public Hearing: 4/17/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-03-21 | House Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 28, PG.1719 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1263s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg.257 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 1263s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.227 | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1263s, 3/21/12; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Hearing: 2/9/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1, Pg.7 |