NH SB245 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - II. Remainder Effective 07/01/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - II. Remainder Effective 07/01/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the siting of energy facilities.
Title
Relative to the siting of energy facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/01/14 |
2014-07-18 | Senate | I. Section 24, 25 & RSA 162-H:21, III as inserted by section 23 Effective 07/11/14 |
2014-07-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/11/14; Chapter 0217 |
2014-06-17 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-2006e Adopted |
2014-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #14-2006eba Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Concurs with House Amendments #1795h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1795h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-14 | House | Amendment #2014-1795h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1795h (Vote 20-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-05-06 | House | Division I Work Session: 5/8/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-05-02 | House | Executive Session: 5/8/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-05-01 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 5/6/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-04-29 | House | Division I Work Session: 5/6/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-04-29 | House | Division I Work Session: 5/1/2014 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-04-24 | House | Division I Work Session: 4/29/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-04-23 | House | Refer to Finance |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1442h Motion Adopted Div 227-69 |
2014-04-23 | House | Amendment #2014-1442h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1442h (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-08 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-04-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/10/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-04-02 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Subcommittee Work Session: 4/16/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/16/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/15/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/9/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2014 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/2014) and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1125s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1125s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1125s, 3/27/14; S11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0921s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0921s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0921s, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 2/19/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |