NH SB244 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a procedure for the annulment of a mental health record and establishing a commission to study mental health and firearms.
Title
Establishing a procedure for the annulment of a mental health record and establishing a commission to study mental health and firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections 1, 4 (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32 |
2014-04-09 | House | =REVISED=Executive Session: 4/22/14 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1114s, New Title, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1114s, New Title, Sections 1, 4, Amendment Adopted, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Sen. Larsen Moved Laid On Table, Motion Failed, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1114s, New Title, Sections 2, 3, 4-I, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote |
2014-03-27 | Senate | The Chair Ruled the Question Divisible: Sections 2, 3, 4-I; Sections 1, 4 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Sen. Bragdon Moved to Divide the Question: Sections 2, 3, 4-I; Sections 1, 4 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Sen. Pierce Moved Laid On Table, Division Vote 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1114s, New Title, 3/27/14; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 1/14/2014, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |