NH SB229 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0189; Effective 09/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0189; Effective 09/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use and disclosure of protected health information.
Title
Relative to the use and disclosure of protected health information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2014; Chapter 0189; Effective 09/09/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Concurs with House Amendment #1528h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2014-05-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1528h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | House | Amendment #2014-1528h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1528h (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 34 |
2014-04-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/23/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-04-18 | House | Continued Executive Session: 4/29/14 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/22/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-04-09 | House | Rescheduled Continued Executive Session: 4/16/14 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 =RECESSED= |
2014-04-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/15/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-04-09 | House | =CANCELLED= Continued Executive Session: 4/17/14 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-04-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/10/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 4/8/14 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205=RECESSED= |
2014-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/8/2014 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/3/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-03-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/13/14; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |