NH HB609 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0088
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0088
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the New Hampshire circuit court to replace the current probate courts, district courts, and judicial branch family division..
Title
Establishing the New Hampshire circuit court to replace the current probate courts, district courts, and judicial branch family division..
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0088 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 17, Pg.344 | |
2011-05-04 | House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1492 | |
2011-05-04 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-1676e Adopted; House Journal 42, PG.1491 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #1676 Adopted; Senate Journal 16, Pg.317 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 13, Pg.270 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13, Pg.266 | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/20/11; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/31/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11, Pg.193 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0739h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.720-728 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0739h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.720-728 | |
2011-03-10 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0739h; House Calendar 23, PG.609-652 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0739h for Mar 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.535 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-23 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 (If Necessary Continued 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208) | |
2011-02-16 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 193 |