NH HB584 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0600h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0600h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to covered prescription drugs.
Title
Relative to covered prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0600h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-08-09 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-05-22 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/28/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-03-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/20/2013 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-03-20 | House | Recommit (Rep J.MacKay): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.844-845 |
2013-03-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0807h; House Calendar 23 PG.633 |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0807h for Mar 20 (Vote 14-0; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.581 |
2013-03-06 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/7/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/5/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/26/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.200 |