NH HB442 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Sen. D’Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16, Pg.331
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of marijuana for medicinal purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of marijuana for medicinal purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-11 Senate Sen. D’Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16, Pg.331
2011-05-11 Senate Committee Amendment 1778s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 16
2011-05-05 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1778s, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23
2011-03-31 Senate Hearing: 4/14/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18
2011-03-23 Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192
2011-03-16 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0734h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 221-96; House Journal 28, PG.858-872
2011-03-16 House Amendment #0734h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.858-872
2011-03-09 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0734h; House Calendar 23, PG.621-634
2011-03-09 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0734h for Mar 15 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.556
2011-03-01 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2011-03-01 House Work Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2011-02-18 House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Representative's Hall (Orig Legislative Office Building 205)
2011-02-02 House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 186

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback