NH HB1622 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting qualifying patients and registered caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.
Title
Permitting qualifying patients and registered caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Wright [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Emily Sandblade [R] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] |
Rep. Tim O'Flaherty [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Interim Study (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/8/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0548h Motion Adopted Div 227-73 |
2014-03-06 | House | Adopt Amendment #0548h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0548h (Vote 13-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2014 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-16 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/30/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-12-20 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |