NH HB1503 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 21Y-2N; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 21Y-2N; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the penalties for negligent homicide and manslaughter causing a miscarriage or stillbirth and relative to miscarriage or stillbirth in second degree murder cases.
Title
Relative to the penalties for negligent homicide and manslaughter causing a miscarriage or stillbirth and relative to miscarriage or stillbirth in second degree murder cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Leon Rideout [R] | Rep. Jane Cormier [R] | Rep. David Murotake [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] |
Rep. Laura Jones [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - Senate - Laid on the Table (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1539s (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1336s (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Laid on the Table (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 243 N: 42 NV: 49 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Adopt FLAM 1091h (Y: 114 N: 170 NV: 50 Abs: 53) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - Adopt 14-0412h (Y: 176 N: 116 NV: 42 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1539s (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1336s (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Laid on the Table (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 243 N: 42 NV: 49 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Adopt FLAM 1091h (Y: 114 N: 170 NV: 50 Abs: 53) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - Adopt 14-0412h (Y: 176 N: 116 NV: 42 Abs: 53) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 21Y-2N; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass Not Voted On; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2014-1539s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Regular Calendar 11Y-12N; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1336s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Regular Calendar 10Y- 13N; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Sen. Lasky Moved Laid on Table, Motion Failed, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1336s, New Title, 4/24/14; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing: 4/8/14, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0412h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 243-42 |
2014-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1091h (Rep. Rideout) Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 114-170 |
2014-03-20 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0412h(NT) Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 176-116 |
2014-03-19 | House | Special Order to 3/20/2014 (Rep. Shurtleff) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2014-03-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0412h (New Title) |
2014-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0412h (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-25 | House | ===CONTINUED=== Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |