NH HB1434 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0239; Effective Date 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0239; Effective Date 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to surrogate health care decision making by a family member or friend.
Title
Relative to surrogate health care decision making by a family member or friend.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Harding [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] |
Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Rep. Rick Watrous [D] |
Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0239; Effective Date 1/1/2015. |
2014-06-25 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled (6/4/14) |
2014-06-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-2015eba, Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015e Adopted |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1918c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1918c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1918c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/23/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Boutin, and Soucy; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Shurtleff, Wallner, Chandler, Nordgren |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1719, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1719s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Special Order HB 1434 to the end of the Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1719s, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 4/15/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/2014 and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0695h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0695h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0695h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/4/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/4/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/4/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/20/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/13/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |