NH HB1360 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/25/2014; Chapter 0256; Section 1 Effective Date 7/1/2015; Remainder Effective 7/25/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/25/2014; Chapter 0256; Section 1 Effective Date 7/1/2015; Remainder Effective 7/25/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to use of certain electronic devices while driving.
Title
Relative to use of certain electronic devices while driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - OTPA (Y: 192 N: 133 NV: 33 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/25/2014; Chapter 0256; Section 1 Effective Date 7/1/2015; Remainder Effective 7/25/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1334s (Rep. Bouchard) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1334s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1334s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1334s, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: === ROOM CHANGE === 4/1/14, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/1/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation |
2014-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0376h(NT) Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-133 |
2014-03-05 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Comerford) Motion Failed Div 137-187 |
2014-03-05 | House | Adopt Amendment #0376h(NT) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | House | Special Order (Rep. Shurtleff) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-02-17 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0376h (New Title) |
2014-02-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0376h (Vote 13-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/28/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/21/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:35 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Transportation |