NH HB1271 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 11-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 11-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the powers and duties of conservation commissions.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the powers and duties of conservation commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 11-0) |
2014-09-19 | House | Executive Session: 9/30/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-05-22 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 6/3/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-03-12 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2014 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |