NH HB1173 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0089; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0089; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the report submission date of the state retiree health plan commission.
Title
Relative to the report submission date of the state retiree health plan commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Muns [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0089; Effective 8/10/2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: 4/23/14, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for TBD (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |