NH HB1158 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance incentives to lower costs of health care.
Title
Relative to insurance incentives to lower costs of health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-30 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-1) |
2014-10-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-10-09 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 10/21/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-03-12 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/04/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/20/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-02-12 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/13/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/13/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-01-31 | House | =CANCELLED= Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/30/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |