NH CACR19 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to dedicated funds. Providing that dedicated funds shall be used solely for the purpose of the fund.
Title
Relating to dedicated funds. Providing that dedicated funds shall be used solely for the purpose of the fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Michael Cahill [D] |
Sen. David Pierce [D] | Rep. Thomas Buco [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - House - Interim Study (Y: 199 N: 65 NV: 78 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-3) |
2014-09-17 | House | Executive Session: 9/17/2014 Legislative Office Building 202 2 Hours after Session (Announced on Floor) |
2014-09-15 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-08-25 | House | ==Room change== Interim Study- Subcommittee Work Session: 8/27/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-08-14 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/27/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-05-15 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-65 |
2014-05-14 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep. Steven Smith) |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 5/6/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-04-16 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 4/24/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-04-16 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 4/22/2014 10:31 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-04-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 4/22/2014 10:31 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-04-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 4/15/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2014 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: 3/5 necessary, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 21Y- 2N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Special Ordered to the call of the Chair, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | ===RESCHEDULED=== Hearing: 3/4/14, Room 100, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | ===CANCELLED=== Hearing: 2/19/14, Room 103, State House, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs |