NE LR413 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Request the United States Department of Agriculture immediately withdraw its proposed rule entitled "Importation of Beef from a Region in Brazil"
Title
Request the United States Department of Agriculture immediately withdraw its proposed rule entitled "Importation of Beef from a Region in Brazil"
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Enrolled resolution |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Adopted |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Chambers FA357 lost |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Chambers FA357 filed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2371 adopted |
2014-03-12 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2371 filed |
2014-03-12 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM2371 |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2014 |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2014-01-17 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2014-01-17 | Legislature | Laid over |
2014-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22178 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR413.pdf |