NE LR395 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize February 10, 2014, as the 60th anniversary of the addition of the words "under God" to the Pledge of Allegiance
Title
Recognize February 10, 2014, as the 60th anniversary of the addition of the words "under God" to the Pledge of Allegiance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2014-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2014 |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Laid over |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21770 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR395.pdf |