NE LB815 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB815 amended into LB788 by AM2925
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB815 amended into LB788 by AM2925
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to fiduciary accounts controlled by a trust department
Title
Change provisions relating to fiduciary accounts controlled by a trust department
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB815 amended into LB788 by AM2925 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2014 |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21654 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB815.pdf |