NE LB713 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB713 amended into LB759 by AM2140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB713 amended into LB759 by AM2140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change state investment officer provisions relating to time deposit open accounts and limits on total deposits
Title
Change state investment officer provisions relating to time deposit open accounts and limits on total deposits
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB713 amended into LB759 by AM2140 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21653 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB713.pdf |