NE LB581 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Clean-burning Motor Fuel Development Act
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Clean-burning Motor Fuel Development Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-4-4 (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-4-4 |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Nordquist FA78 adopted |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Nordquist FA78 filed |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER141 adopted |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER141 filed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER141 |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Friesen AM1743 adopted |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Friesen AM1743 filed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Friesen AM1666 withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1660 withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM935 adopted |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Friesen AM1666 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1660 filed |
2015-05-12 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2015-03-23 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM935 filed |
2015-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM935 |
2015-03-16 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2015-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 11, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |