NE LB565 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to registering to vote and requesting a ballot for early voting at the same time
Title
Change provisions relating to registering to vote and requesting a ballot for early voting at the same time
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 15, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 37-3-9 |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER233 adopted |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER233 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER233 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Nelson AM2671 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Nelson AM2671 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM810 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Harr FA287 withdrawn |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Correction |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Harr FA287 pending |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Harr FA287 filed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Harr FA286 lost |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Harr FA286 filed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Karpisek AM2553 lost |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM810 pending |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Karpisek AM2553 filed |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Nelson priority bill |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-04-02 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM810 filed |
2013-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM810 |
2013-03-18 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |