NE LB558 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to certain declaratory judgments and illegal taxes paid
Title
Change provisions relating to certain declaratory judgments and illegal taxes paid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA335 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA335 filed |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 20, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |