NE LB267 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit persons on parole, probation, or work release from acting as undercover agents or employees of law enforcement and prohibit admissibility of certain evidence
Title
Prohibit persons on parole, probation, or work release from acting as undercover agents or employees of law enforcement and prohibit admissibility of certain evidence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2013 |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18676 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB267.pdf |