NE LB204 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change and provide criminal sanctions regarding animals and animal facilities
Title
Change and provide criminal sanctions regarding animals and animal facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2013 |
2013-01-28 | Legislature | Schilz name added |
2013-01-28 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh name added |
2013-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=17956 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB204.pdf |