NE LB204 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-01-08 - Title printed. Carryover bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change and provide criminal sanctions regarding animals and animal facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change and provide criminal sanctions regarding animals and animal facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill.
2013-03-06LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 13, 2013
2013-01-28LegislatureSchilz name added
2013-01-28LegislatureLautenbaugh name added
2013-01-17LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2013-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback