ND SCR4009 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on February 1 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 1 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution declaring February 2011 as "American Heart Month" and Friday, February 4, 2011, "National Wear Red Day" in North Dakota and encouraging all citizens to wear red to raise awareness of cardiovascular disease.
Title
A concurrent resolution declaring February 2011 as "American Heart Month" and Friday, February 4, 2011, "National Wear Red Day" in North Dakota and encouraging all citizens to wear red to raise awareness of cardiovascular disease.
Sponsors
Sen. Spencer Berry [R] | Rep. Brenda Heller [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | Signed by President | |
2011-02-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-01-31 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced, first reading | |
2011-01-26 | Received from Senate | |
2011-01-25 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-01-24 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |