ND 2368 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 14-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on and penalties for performing an abortion; to amend and reenact sections 14-02.1-01, 14-02.1-02, and 14-02.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions and reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions and reporting requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-17SenateSigned by Governor 04/16
2013-04-16SenateSent to Governor
2013-04-16SenateSigned by President
2013-04-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 60 nays 32
2013-04-12HouseConference committee report adopted
2013-04-08HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House recede)
2013-04-05SenateConference committee report adopted
2013-04-03SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House recede)
2013-03-29HouseConference committee appointed Weisz Silbernagel Oversen
2013-03-27SenateConference committee appointed Berry Lyson Grabinger
2013-03-27SenateRefused to concur
2013-03-25SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2013-03-22HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 60 nays 32
2013-03-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-03-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 0
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-02-21HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2013-02-19HouseReceived from Senate
2013-02-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 17
2013-02-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-02-14SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2013-02-06SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2013-01-28SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback