ND 2020 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state water commission; to create and enact a new subsection to section 11-37-02 and a new section to chapter 61-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to joint powers entities and commerce authorities and metering certain water sources; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 11-37-03, section 11-37-04, subsection 8 of section 11-37-06, and subsection 1 of section 11-37-08 of the North Dakota Century Code and section 7 of chapter 20 of the 2009 Session Laws, relating to conversion of joint powers entities to commerce authorities and additional powers of commerce authorities and Fargo flood control project funding; to provide exemptions; to provide a transfer; to repeal section 5 of chapter 535 of the 1999 Session Laws, relating to pledge of revenues from the Grand Forks corporate center; to provide legislative intent; to provide for retroactive application; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pledge of revenues from the Grand Forks corporate center; to provide legislative intent; to provide for retroactive application; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-20 Filed with Secretary Of State 05/18
2011-05-20 Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/18
2011-04-28 Signed by President
2011-04-28 Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2011-04-28 Conference committee report rejected
2011-04-27 Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2011-04-13 Conference committee appointed Skarphol Monson Williams
2011-04-12 Refused to concur
2011-04-11 Returned to Senate (12)
2011-04-11 Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
2011-04-08 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1
2011-03-17 Committee Hearing 02:15
2011-03-02 Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee
2011-02-24 Received from Senate
2011-02-24 Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
2011-02-23 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
2011-01-13 Committee Hearing 02:30
2011-01-04 Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback