ND 2002 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-30 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the judicial branch; and to amend and reenact section 27-02-02, subsection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Salaries of supreme and district court judges and disposition of vacant judgeships.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-30SenateSigned by Governor 04/30
2013-04-30SenateSent to Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by President
2013-04-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-04-29HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 4
2013-04-29HouseConference committee report adopted
2013-04-26HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2013-04-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted
2013-04-26SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2013-04-17HouseConference committee appointed Sanford Brandenburg Guggisberg
2013-04-17SenateConference committee appointed Kilzer Carlisle Warner
2013-04-17SenateRefused to concur
2013-04-16SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2013-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 10
2013-04-11HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-04-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 5 2
2013-03-19HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2013-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-03-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2013-02-27HouseReceived from Senate
2013-02-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2013-02-26SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-02-25SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
2013-01-24SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2013-01-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback