ND 1456 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 14-02.1 and a new subsection to section 43-17-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on abortion after determination of detectable heartbeat in an unborn child and to grounds for disciplinary action for physicians; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitations on abortion after determination of detectable heartbeat in an unborn child and to grounds for disciplinary action for physicians; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-26HouseSigned by Governor 03/26
2013-03-26HouseSent to Governor
2013-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-03-19SenateSigned by President
2013-03-18HouseReturned to House
2013-03-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 26 nays 17
2013-03-14SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 3 0
2013-03-12SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2013-02-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2013-02-25SenateReceived from House
2013-02-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 28
2013-02-07HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-02-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 1
2013-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2013-01-21HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback