ND HB1106 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-23.5-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to appraisal management companies.
Title
Appraisal management companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 6 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |