NC S812 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Ch. SL 2014-78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Ch. SL 2014-78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Replace CCSS w/NC''s Higher Academ. Standards
Title
Replace CCSS w/NC''s Higher Academ. Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-16 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 71 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 62 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-07-10 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A2 Cotham Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A1 Cotham Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 62 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-07-10 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A2 Cotham Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - A1 Cotham Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Ch. SL 2014-78 | |
2014-07-22 | Signed by Gov. 7/22/2014 | |
2014-07-16 | Pres. To Gov. 07/16/2014 | |
2014-07-16 | Ratified | |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-16 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/16/2014 |
2014-07-14 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2014 |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-06-30 | House | Respond to Senate Fail to Concur - Appoint Conferees Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-30 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-06-25 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2014-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2014 |
2014-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-11 | House | Ref To Com On Education |
2014-06-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-10 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2014-06-05 | Engrossed | |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1061 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education