NC S288 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wake Comm Vacancy & Aberdeen Zoning
Title
Wake Comm Vacancy & Aberdeen Zoning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-17 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Ch. SL 2013-270 | |
2013-07-18 | Ratified | |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/17/2013 |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-07-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/16/2013 |
2013-07-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Redistricting |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed |