NC S15 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Ch. Res 2013-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Ch. Res 2013-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Jean Preston
Title
Honor Jean Preston
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Ch. Res 2013-16 | |
2013-06-20 | Ratified | |
2013-06-19 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-19 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-06-19 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H262 (Same As) 2013-03-11 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House