NC H751 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-06-12 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

NC Religious Freedom Restoration Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC Religious Freedom Restoration Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2013-06-10HouseFiscal Note Attached
2013-05-15HouseFiscal Note Requested
2013-05-15HouseAdded to Calendar
2013-05-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-05-15HouseReptd Fav
2013-04-11HouseRef To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
2013-04-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-10HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback