NC H589 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-08-12 - Ch. SL 2013-381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

VIVA/Election Reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIVA/Election Reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-25 - M11 Concur (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 11 and 13 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - Motion 12- Committee of the Whole (Y: 41 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-07-25 - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-07-25 - Amendment 14 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 0 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-07-25 - Amendment 13 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - Amendment 11 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-07-24 - Amendment 10 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - Amendment 9 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - Amendment 8 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-07-24 - Amendment 7 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - Amendment 6 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - Amendment 2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - Amendment 5 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-24 - Amendment 4 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - A10 Ross, D. Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 69 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - A9 Hall, D. Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - A8 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - A7 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 74 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - A6 Fisher Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - A5 Graham, C. Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - A4 Adams Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - A2 Jackson Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - A1 Tine Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-12 Ch. SL 2013-381
2013-08-12 Signed by Gov. 8/12/2013
2013-07-29 Pres. To Gov. 7/29/2013
2013-07-26 Ratified
2013-07-25HouseOrdered Enrolled
2013-07-25HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2013-07-25HouseConcurred In S Amend SA13
2013-07-25HouseConcurred In S Amend SA11
2013-07-25HouseRec as Amended
2013-07-25HouseRec From Senate
2013-07-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-07-25SenateAmend Tabled A14
2013-07-25SenateAmend Adopted A13
2013-07-25SenateAmendment Withdrawn A12
2013-07-25SenateAmend Adopted A11
2013-07-24 Engrossed
2013-07-24SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-07-24SenateAmend Failed A10
2013-07-24SenateAmend Failed A9
2013-07-24SenateAmend Tabled A8
2013-07-24SenateAmend Failed A7
2013-07-24SenateAmend Adopted A6
2013-07-24SenateAmend Failed A2
2013-07-24SenateAmendment Withdrawn A3
2013-07-24SenateAmend Adopted A5
2013-07-24SenateAmend Adopted A4
2013-07-24SenateAmendment Withdrawn A1
2013-07-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2013-07-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-04-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2013-04-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-25SenateRec From House
2013-04-24HouseOrdered Engrossed
2013-04-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-04-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-04-24HouseAmend Failed A10
2013-04-24HouseAmend Failed A9
2013-04-24HouseAmend Failed A8
2013-04-24HouseAmend Failed A7
2013-04-24HouseAmend Adopted A6
2013-04-24HouseAmend Adopted A5
2013-04-24HouseAmendment Withdrawn A3
2013-04-24HouseAmend Failed A4
2013-04-24HouseAmend Failed A2
2013-04-24HouseAmend Adopted A1
2013-04-23HousePlaced On Cal For 04/24/2013
2013-04-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-04-23HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2013-04-18HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2013-04-18HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2013-04-17HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2013-04-17HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-04-17HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations Added
2013-04-17HouseSerial Referral To Finance Added
2013-04-08HouseRef To Com On Elections
2013-04-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-04HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2013&BillID=H589&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v7.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v8.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H589v9.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=340
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=341
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=342
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=343
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=344
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=345
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=346
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=347
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=348
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=349
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=350
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=858
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=859
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=860
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=861
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=862
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=863
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=864
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=865
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=866
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=879
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=880
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=881
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=882
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1335
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1336
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1337

Bill Comments

feedback