NC H243 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liens/Self-Service Storage Facilities
Title
Liens/Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - House - C RPT Adopted (Y: 92 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 47 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 23 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - A4 Brawley, W. Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - A3 Luebke Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - A2 Murry Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 47 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 23 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - A4 Brawley, W. Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - A3 Luebke Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - A2 Murry Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Ch. SL 2013-239 | |
2013-07-03 | Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013 | |
2013-06-26 | Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2013 | |
2013-06-25 | Ratified | |
2013-06-20 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-20 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2013-06-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2013 |
2013-06-19 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/18/2013 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-05-21 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-05-21 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/21/2013 |
2013-05-16 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-05-15 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-05-15 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/09/2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-03 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Amend Failed A4 |
2013-04-02 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2013-04-02 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-03-27 | House | Postponed To 04/02/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-03-21 | House | Postponed To 03/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/21/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-19 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2013-03-07 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee C, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S263 (Same As) 2013-03-13 - Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance