MT SR1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Rules Resolution
Title
Senate Rules Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-09 - Senate - (S) Resolution Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-01-12 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-01-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-01-12 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-01-12 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-01-09 | Senate | (S) Resolution Adopted |
2015-01-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-07 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted as Amended (S) Rules |
2015-01-06 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Rules |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Rules |
2014-12-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-10 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-12-10 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |