MT SB95 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to multi-state tax compact advisory council
Title
Revise laws related to multi-state tax compact advisory council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-02-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-02-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-02-16 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-14 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2015-01-21 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-01-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2015-01-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2014-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-12-12 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-12 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-11-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-10-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-09-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-09-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-09-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-09-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2014-09-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-09-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-05-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |