MT SB72 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing political party endorsements and expenditures in judicial races
Title
Allowing political party endorsements and expenditures in judicial races
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-02-22 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-02-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2015-02-02 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-02 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2015-01-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2014-12-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-11 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-08-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |