MT SB1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide rule-making authority for secretary of state to establish certain fees
Title
Provide rule-making authority for secretary of state to establish certain fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-09 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-09 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-02-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-02-22 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-02-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2015-01-20 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-01-15 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2015-01-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2015-01-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2015-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2014-12-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2014-12-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2014-11-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-11-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-11-10 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-10-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-10-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-10-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-10-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-10-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2014-10-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-10-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-06-30 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-06-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |