MT HB574 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish "small herd exemption" to certain laws related to the sale of milk
Title
Establish "small herd exemption" to certain laws related to the sale of milk
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-04-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-04-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2013-04-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-04-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-03-28 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-28 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2013-03-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-02-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-02-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-20 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Agriculture
Consumer Protection
Health
Revenue, State
Rule Making
State/Other Government Levels, Immunity From Suit
Consumer Protection
Health
Revenue, State
Rule Making
State/Other Government Levels, Immunity From Suit