MT HB474 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Business and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize a Montana state bank

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize a Montana state bank

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24House(H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Business and Labor
2013-03-28House(H) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
2013-03-27House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor
2013-02-19House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2013-02-19House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2013-02-19House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2013-02-18House(H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
2013-02-14House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor
2013-02-14House(H) First Reading
2013-02-13 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2013-02-13House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2013-02-13House(H) Introduced
2013-02-12 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2013-02-11 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2013-02-11 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2013-02-11 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2013-02-11 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2013-02-11 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2013-02-09 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2013-02-09 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2013-02-08 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2013-02-08 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2013-02-07 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
2013-02-06 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2013-02-06 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2013-02-04 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2013-01-31 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2012-12-17 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback