MT HB302 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit state enforcement of any federal ban on semi-auto firearms/magazines
Title
Prohibit state enforcement of any federal ban on semi-auto firearms/magazines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2013-03-28 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-03-22 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-03-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-07 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-25 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |