MS SC643 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Declaring Stone County, Mississippi, To Be The "mural County Of Mississippi" And Encouraging Tourism To The County.
Title
Declaring Stone County, Mississippi, to be the "Mural County of Mississippi."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Adopted | |
2012-04-26 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-25 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-04-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-25 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-25 | Adopted | |
2012-04-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Referred To Rules |